Accounts and annual returns GOOD SHEPHERD RELIEF IN NEED

Charity number: 1177783
Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 November 2024 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 September 2023 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 June 2022 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 June 2022 149 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 April 2021 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 April 2021 73 days late Download Open in new window