Financial history GOOD SHEPHERD RELIEF IN NEED

Charity number: 1177783
Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.93k £34.94k £79.78k £69.92k £300
Total expenditure £68.37k £22.77k £87.14k £68.75k £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £15.30k £5.00k N/A N/A