INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR EQUITATION SCIENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mission of ISES is to promote and encourage the application of objective research and advanced practice which will ultimately improve the welfare of horses in their associations with humans.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jersey
- Mexico
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Peru
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Cathrynne Charlotte Henshall | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caleigh Copelin | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Douglas | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANNE WINTHER CHRISTENSEN | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Helen Fenner | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katrina Merkies | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.40k | £12.60k | £24.29k | £21.06k | £16.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.30k | £3.66k | £16.12k | £16.44k | £31.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 March 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 March 2021 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EQUITATION SCIENCE* AND PRACTICE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE TRAINING OF HORSES TO ENHANCE HORSE WELFARE AND IMPROVE THE HORSE–RIDER RELATIONSHIP AND THE DISSEMINATION OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC; 2. APPLYING VALID, QUANTITATIVE SCIENTIFIC METHODS TO CREATE EVIDENCE-BASED MEASURES TO INFORM EQUESTRIAN PRACTICES; AND 3. RAISING AWARENESS OF EQUINE LEARNING THEORY AND ITS CURRENT APPLICATION. *EQUITATION SCIENCE PROMOTES AN OBJECTIVE, EVIDENCE-BASED UNDERSTANDING OF THE WELFARE OF HORSES DURING TRAINING AND COMPETITION BY APPLYING VALID, QUANTITATIVE SCIENTIFIC METHODS THAT CAN IDENTIFY WHAT TRAINING TECHNIQUES ARE INEFFECTIVE OR MAY RESULT IN EQUINE SUFFERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mere House Farm
Baddiley Hall Lane
Baddiley
NANTWICH
Cheshire
CW5 8BS
- Phone:
- 044 7817 220605
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window