GURU NANAK GURDWARA, PROSPECT STREET, HUDDERSFIELD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the Sikh religion by the provision of a Gurdwara for Sikhs living in Kirklees and Calderdale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

21 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 17 January 2018: Standard registration
- 04 March 2025: Funds received from 1122132 SIKH LEISURE CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALWANT SINGH SOHAL | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEPUK SINGH | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SURINDER SINGH | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARBJIT SINGH | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
HARI SINGH | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kala Singh | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
BALRAJ SINGH RANDHAWA | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PARAMJIT SINGH | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAKHAN SINGH | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAJBIR KAUR BASRA | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUBA SINGH | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gurpal Singh | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAJINDER KAUR BHULLAR | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SITAL KAUR JOHAL | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rajdeep Singh Randhawa | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harjinder singh Johal | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
INDERPAL SINGH RANDHAWA | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
BALWINDER SINGH PAWAR | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Piara Singh | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Singh | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAKHVINDER SINGH JOHAL | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.98k | £230.76k | £261.40k | £316.07k | £339.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.66k | £113.99k | £190.33k | £238.24k | £362.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
‘THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN HUDDERSFIELD BY: · MANAGING AND RUNNING THE GURDWARA ACCORDING TO THE SIKH RITES (SIKH REHAT MARYADA); ARRANGING FOR THE CELEBRATION OF BIRTHDAY, MARTYRDOM DAY AND ANNIVERSARIES OF SIKH GURUS WITH GREAT DIGNITY AND REVERENCE; ARRANGING FOR MARRIAGE CEREMONY ACCORDING TO THE SIKH RITES AND THE PREVAILING LAW OF THIS COUNTRY; · THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, READINGS FROM THE GURU GRANTH SAHIB (SCRIPTURES), LECTURES, TEACHINGS; ARRANGING FOR THE TEACHING OF PUNJABI FOR INTERESTED SIKHS AND OTHER STUDENTS AND TO PROMOTE SPORTS, YOUTH CLUBS AND SOCIAL ORGANISATIONS; AND · PROVIDING PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS.’
Area of benefit
WEST, EAST AND NORTH RIDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guru Nanak Gurdwara
Prospect Street
Huddersfield
England
HD1 2NX
- Phone:
- 07939354145
- Email:
- gnghuddersfield75@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window