Financial history CUTTESLOWE SCHOOL FRIENDS

Charity Number: 1176411
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £10.57k £6.29k £1.47k £9.12k £21.56k
Total expenditure £6.59k £9.01k £4.07k £3.13k £6.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A