CLOTHE ME - THANK YOU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty or financial hardship in particular but not exclusively by providing grants via redeemable vouchers for everyday clothing to individuals and families in financial need. The redeemable vouchers are able to be redeemed exclusively at participating charity shops throughout the United Kingdom of Great Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 June 2018: CIO registration
- Clothing Collective (Working name)
- CLOTH ME - THANK YOU (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Curran | Chair | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Michael Sadler | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Penney | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Duncan | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY WROE | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.53k | £8.32k | £34.97k | £15.90k | £28.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £3.75k | £12.91k | £29.78k | £23.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 18 JUN 2018 AMENDED ON 4 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANTS VIA REDEEMABLE VOUCHERS FOR EVERYDAY CLOTHING TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clothing Collective
5th Floor
167-169 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07918735319
- Email:
- info@clothingcollective.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window