Financial history RETIRED BAPTIST MINISTERS HOUSING ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1177649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.00m £2.14m £2.07m £4.37m £4.81m
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.26m £1.62m £2.72m £3.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £652.55k £808.62k £397.88k £204.13k £68.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £682.32k £660.65k £669.74k £677.59k £721.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £660.87k £671.41k £1.01m £1.64m £1.71m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.85m £2.32m
Income - Legacies £633.99k £784.35k £96.61k £172.85k £36.70k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.26m £1.62m £2.72m £3.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £39.33k £12.03k £0 £20.57k £13.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0