Financial history PHYSIONET FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1175932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £88.35k £92.36k £98.19k £146.02k £182.24k
Total expenditure £73.21k £77.95k £108.69k £136.10k £191.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A