PHYSIONET FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1175932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The collection and restoration of unwanted wheelchairs and other disability equipment that would otherwise go to landfill and the dispatch thereof to developing countries for the use of appropiate people who would otherwise be uable to obtain such equipment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £182,242
Total expenditure: £191,768

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Benin
  • Bhutan
  • Bonaire
  • Bulgaria
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Ecuador
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Fiji
  • Ghana
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Lesotho
  • Malawi
  • Mexico
  • Moldova
  • Romania
  • Rwanda
  • Samoa
  • Sierra Leone
  • South Africa
  • Sri Lanka
  • Syria
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Gambia
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 2017: CIO registration
  • 17 April 2019: Funds received from 1135684 PHYSIONET
  • 13 September 2023: Funds received from 1107260 WHEELCHAIR FOUNDATION UK
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Douglas Perrott Chair 14 November 2024
None on record
Caroline Mary Sapwell Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Richard Anthony Stevens Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Edward Owen Netsel Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
MILTON ALLAN FRARY Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Russell Rollings Trustee 10 February 2021
None on record
Carl Peter Anderson Stitt BA, CPA Trustee 26 November 2017
None on record
Harry Franks Trustee 26 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £88.35k £92.36k £98.19k £146.02k £182.24k
Total expenditure £73.21k £77.95k £108.69k £136.10k £191.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHATSWORTH HOUSE
HORSEFAIR
BOROUGHBRIDGE
YORK
YO51 9AA
Phone:
01423325190