Accounts and annual returns THE ROGER BEGY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1175852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 January 2025 348 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 January 2025 348 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 April 2023 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 April 2023 449 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 October 2024 1347 days late Download Open in new window