Financial history KINGS NORTON & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1176838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.87k £1.82k £9.55k £10.54k £6.84k
Total expenditure £8.04k £2.55k £6.17k £9.71k £3.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A