Trustees KINGS NORTON & DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1176838

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Stowell | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Lanfear | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jean Jones | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Ann Amor | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Baden Locke | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Brown | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Sandra George | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Locke Lusher | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
VICKY HONE | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BERYL BLOOD | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.