Financial history THE RIOT ENSEMBLE

Charity number: 1178276
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £138.12k £157.64k £164.15k £238.40k £149.95k
Total expenditure £125.75k £114.73k £223.33k £192.00k £129.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A