Financial history CASTLE HILL COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1178607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £158.94k £116.14k £125.11k £132.18k £189.92k
Total expenditure £179.46k £90.27k £100.03k £104.16k £192.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £19.91k £14.26k £0 £2.36k