Financial history THE DONCASTER EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 511214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.39k £72.59k £78.20k £87.51k £84.91k
Total expenditure £68.92k £55.61k £64.43k £78.39k £78.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A