THE DONCASTER EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 511214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancment of the Christian religion by the proclamation and furtherance of the gospel of God, concerning His Son Jesus Christ the Lord and the preaching and teaching of the Word of God

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £84,912
Total expenditure: £78,338

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Doncaster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DONCASTER EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Stone Trustee 01 June 2021
DONCASTER EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Recently registered
Gerard Dixey Trustee 01 June 2021
DONCASTER EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Recently registered
Gareth Warren James Trustee 01 June 2021
GO TEACH PUBLICATIONS LIMITED
Received: On time
KENNETH JAQUES PROUDMAN Trustee 18 September 2013
DONCASTER SCHOOLS WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
DONCASTER SCHOOLS WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW PLUMB Trustee
None on record
RAYMOND EDWARD SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.39k £72.59k £78.20k £87.51k £84.91k
Total expenditure £68.92k £55.61k £64.43k £78.39k £78.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 March 2023 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Sunningdale Road
Hatfield Woodhouse
DONCASTER
DN7 6PE
Phone:
01302840087