Financial history THE MARJORIE DEANE FINANCIAL JOURNALISM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £250.17k £243.15k £269.69k £280.40k £275.43k
Total expenditure £152.76k £296.40k £324.36k £224.07k £762.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A