NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We demonstrate the Christian faith by serving as a fellowship for church members and seek to reach into the community with the Christian message. We support people doing similar work in the UK and overseas. We hold regular courses for new Christians, distribute Christian literature every month, support the local food bank and offer lunch each month after our outreach service for all in attendance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 June 2018: CIO registration
- 11 October 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 211454 RETIRED MISSIONARY AID FUND
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1124015 NEW HOPE FOR CHILDREN
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1151746 THE BAY FOODBANK
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1173851 ECHOES INTERNATIONAL
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1156107 M10 MISSIONS
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1186660 MESSAGE ON THE MOVE
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 292822 OPERATION KURZWEIL
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 299128 UNITED CHRISTIAN BROADCASTERS LIMITED
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 327384 OUR DAILY BREAD MINISTRIES TRUST
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 264278 COUNTIES
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1064598 MISSION AVIATION FELLOWSHIP UK
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 221605 GOOD NEWS FOR EVERYONE!
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1113463 CARIAD KENYA
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 267322 EMMAUS BIBLE SCHOOL UK
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 251233 WYCLIFFE UK LIMITED
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1073210 LIVING WORD POSTAL BIBLE SCHOOL
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1181782 SOUTHERN AFRICA LITERATURE TRUST
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1094198 SHAREAFRICA
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1117909 FOUNTAIN OF PEACE CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION UK
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1149241 REGENT CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 287610 PREMIER CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1200235 MEDICAL MISSIONARY NEWS
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 233363 TRANS WORLD RADIO LIMITED
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 298767 BRASS TACKS LIMITED
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1097217 CHRISTIANS AGAINST POVERTY
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 215409 THE OPEN-AIR MISSION
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1149548 BETHESDA EVANGELICAL CHURCH
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297.86k | £13.96k | £20.01k | £14.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.69k | £19.20k | £56.69k | £79.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
05 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 2.1 THE PURSUIT OF THE SERVICE OF GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENT OF THE HOLY BIBLE AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS BIBLICAL BASIS; AND 2.2 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH 2.1 ABOVE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window