Trustees WHITECROSS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1176075

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Kettle | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Ayres | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Flynn | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Talling | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Simmons | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wakeham | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Pearce | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOAN ELIZABETH BUNT | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER GAVIN DAVID SHAKERLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Wakeham | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sophia Luck | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIM LOUISE CARCAS | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN SHAKERLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.