Financial history FUTURE FIT - JUNIOR FIELD GUN

Charity number: 1177870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.90k £30.58k £40.06k £16.36k £70.33k
Total expenditure £37.70k £15.53k £25.47k £63.26k £71.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A