Trustees AVON VALLEY PARTNERSHIP YOUTH AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1180169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN MARY LEDGER Chair 03 June 2019
None on record
Diane Paton Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Mary Melbourne Trustee 06 March 2024
CHARITY OF HENRY BARON JAMES
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE DAME EDITH MAUD WEBSTER HULSE CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 213 days
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FORDINGBRIDGE AND HYDE AND BREAMORE AND HALE WITH WOODGREEN
Received: On time
Sarah Morand De La Perrell Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Irene Canton Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record