Accounts and annual returns CHESHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 511356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 June 2023 233 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late Download Open in new window