Financial history NORTHWICK PARK CARDIAC RESEARCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1177753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £655.03k £207.74k £583.52k £371.05k £352.64k
Total expenditure £610.67k £122.58k £588.87k £476.55k £436.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.29k N/A £398.43k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £11.00k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £578.59k N/A £185.00k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £64.16k N/A £83 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £610.67k N/A £588.87k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A