Governing document NORTHWICK PARK CARDIAC RESEARCH CHARITY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2018 as amended on 13 Feb 2020 as amended on 12 Jun 2023 as amended on 02 Aug 2023 as amended on 04 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
To promote and protect good health for the public benefit by carrying out medical research in particular but not exclusively into finding new treatments for heart disease, researching methods of assessing cardiac function and the development of interventional devices. To disseminate the results of such research for the public benefit. Offering education and training in the diagnosis, treatment and research of cardiac disease.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.