Financial history SUTTERTON PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 511473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £700 £1.23k £603 £900 £780
Total expenditure £932 £693 £1.65k £1.02k £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A