Financial history THIRTY PERCY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.76m £5.30m £5.10m £5.35m £5.67m
Total expenditure £2.87m £5.58m £4.47m £4.86m £4.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.66m £5.18m £4.97m £5.20m £5.55m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £94.41k £113.19k £124.13k £149.38k £119.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.83k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.87m £5.58m £4.47m £4.86m £4.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £30.04k £29.65k £30.60k £33.69k £34.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.23m £4.57m £3.28m £3.78m £3.06m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0