WEYMOUTH SAILING CLUB CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to promote and facilitate community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for sailing to those resident in the local and greater Weymouth area and surrounding regions. Based in Weymouth harbour, we provide tuition and a full programme of racing throughout the season in Club owned and Members dinghies and keelboats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 04 June 2018: CIO registration
- WEYMOUTH SAILING CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Bax Vines | Chair | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Keedy | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Calver | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Lovat Fraser | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £976.52k | £222.00k | £213.03k | £219.91k | £285.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.44k | £176.66k | £161.81k | £190.21k | £288.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.15k | £25.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £738.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £72.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £164.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £974 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £210.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 September 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 September 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 05 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SAILING TO THOSE RESIDENT IN THE LOCAL AND GREATER WEYMOUTH AREA AND SURROUNDING REGIONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOTHE PARADE
WEYMOUTH
DORSET
DT4 8TX
- Phone:
- 01305785481
- Email:
- mail@wsc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window