Housing Matters (Bristol)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Housing Matters (Bristol) provides free, independent and confidential advice to anyone in housing need. Through a combination of advice, support and advocacy we enable clients to resolve housing issues, improve housing conditions and prevent homelessness. Previously known as Churches Housing Aid Society, we have been providing this much needed service since 1965 (previous charity number 233757).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 October 2018: Standard registration
- 06 April 2019: Funds received from 233757 CHURCHES HOUSING AID SOCIETY
- CHAS (BRISTOL) (Working name)
- Housing Matters (Working name)
- CHURCHES HOUSING AID SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Winifred Eberrchukwu Onyemaechi | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Kevin Saunders | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Kate Martin she/her | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Fiona Mylchreest | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Gordon Marshall-Jones | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Gibbard | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Meirion Mathias | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Jordan | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.14k | £278.61k | £337.48k | £391.79k | £439.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.11k | £228.30k | £284.87k | £367.74k | £432.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 OCT 2018 as amended on 25 Feb 2021 as amended on 14 Nov 2022 as amended on 09 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN THE BRISTOL AND SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY 1) PROVIDING ADVICE ON AND ASSISTANCE WITH HOUSING AND RELATED MATTERS INCLUDING WELFARE BENEFITS, 2) ACTING AS ADVOCATE ON BEHALF OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC FOR WHOM THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO ASSIST AND TO REPRESENT AT TRIBUNALS AND COURT HEARINGS AND TO UNDERTAKE LEGAL WORK ON THEIR BEHALF, 3) THE CARRYING OUT OF LOBBYING ON HOUSING AND RELATED ISSUES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Easton Business Centre
Felix Road
Easton
Bristol
BS5 0HE
- Phone:
- 01179351260
- Email:
- admin@housingmatters.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window