Financial history SUTTON UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £61.59k £34.39k £113.55k £159.76k £171.66k
Total expenditure £50.98k £42.75k £72.79k £148.50k £129.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k