BACKBARROW IRONWORKS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Protecting and preserving the Backbarrow Ironworks Scheduled Ancient Monument. Researching its history in the context of the development of the iron industry and other local industries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
Total income includes £3,229 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD RAYMOND WILLIAM SANDERSON | Chair | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BAKER | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT VICTOR MATTHEWS | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY SANDERSON | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £5.42k | £4 | £112 | £3.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £586 | £1.54k | £3.14k | £246 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 January 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 14 January 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE INDUSTRIAL HISTORY OF BACKBARROW AND DISTRICT BY (A) OWNING, PROTECTING AND PRESERVING THE BACKBARROW IRONWORKS FURNACE AND ASSOCIATED STRUCTURES AND BUILDINGS (B) ENSURING THAT THE FURNACE AND ITS SITE ARE ACCESSIBLE AND INTERPRETED FOR THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC (C) RESEARCHING, RECORDING AND ARCHIVING INFORMATION WITH A VIEW TO CREATING FURTHER UNDERSTANDING OF THE SIGNIFICANCE OF THE FURNACE IN INDUSTRIAL HISTORY (D) SHARING AVAILABLE INFORMATION WITH THE PUBLIC (E) RELATING THE IRONWORKS TO OTHER INDUSTRIES IN THE LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWTON
7 Water Close
Backbarrow
ULVERSTON
LA12 8QZ
- Phone:
- 07772960093
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window