Financial history Manchester Imagination Library

Charity number: 1177843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.29k £14.25k £17.49k £6.73k £5.96k
Total expenditure £9.65k £6.22k £5.45k £12.12k £16.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A