Financial history UK FRIENDS OF YESHIVAT SHAAREI SHMUOS

Charity number: 1178332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £75.82k £38.04k £2.45k £0 £6.44k
Total expenditure £77.06k £30.10k £600 £672 £504
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A