Hernia International Carpenter

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports the provision of healthcare to the community of Carpenter and surrounding region in Northern Ghana. The charity will provide financial assistance, surgical operations, surgical equipment, healthcare facilities, advice and medical education. The charity supports a team to provide surgery for patients suffering with hernia and other surgical conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ghana
Governance
- 11 May 2018: Standard registration
- HERNIA INTERNATIONAL CARPENTER (Working name)
- HERNIAS IN AFRICA (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHARLES JACKSON HICKS MS FRCS | Chair | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNE LOUISE ZEIDLER | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE PARTRICA HICKS MRCGP | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.44k | £23.17k | £7.18k | £504 | £7.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.79k | £566 | £0 | £565 | £11.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 MAY 2018 as amended on 20 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY OF CARPENTER AND SURROUNDING REGIONS IN NORTHERN GHANA OF PATIENTS SUFFERING WITH HERNIA AND OTHER SURGICAL CONDITIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SURGICAL OPERATIONS, SURGICAL EQUIPMENT, HEALTHCARE FACILITIES, ADVICE AND MEDICAL EDUCATION. · SUPPORTING A TEAM TO PROVIDE SURGERY FOR PATIENTS SUFFERING WITH HERNIA AND OTHER SURGICAL CONDITIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 NORTHAMPTON ROAD
YARDLEY HASTINGS
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 1EX
- Phone:
- 01604696721
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window