SUNDERLAND CONNECT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are bringing Christians, Churches and communities together by building an active network that encourages conversation to bring about transformation of the City of Sunderland, Washington and the Coalfields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sunderland
Governance
- 05 November 2018: CIO registration
- 07 February 2025: Funds received from 1175349 SUNDERLAND COMMUNITY CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Watson | Chair | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatoyin Onabowu | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Rushton | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Lorraine Cook | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Nicholson | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.00k | £30.21k | £38.66k | £90.93k | £71.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.40k | £24.49k | £27.84k | £62.69k | £74.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE CITY OF SUNDERLAND AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO BUILD CAPACITY THROUGH PROVISION OF A RESOURCE BASE FOR THE VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY SECTOR AND PROVIDE THEM WITH SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES THAT ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING LOCAL CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS THAT MAY BE APPROPRIATE FOR LOCAL COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BROOMSHIELDS CLOSE
SUNDERLAND
SR5 1SJ
- Phone:
- 07588471808
- Email:
- info@connectnetwork.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window