Financial history GET HIGH VOLARE

Charity number: 1179224
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/03/2020 03/03/2021 03/03/2022 03/03/2023 03/03/2024
Total gross income £10.19k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A