Financial history PETERBOROUGH ALMSHOUSE TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1179603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £250.76k £252.53k £261.15k £270.93k £280.98k
Total expenditure £413.44k £277.75k £270.43k £472.17k £368.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £821 £406 N/A N/A N/A