Trustees PETERBOROUGH ALMSHOUSE TRUST CIO
Charity number: 1179603

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA MARY BEDFORD | Chair | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rebecca Yates | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Browne | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN PARSONS | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Martin | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Michelle Dalliston | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Whiteley | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Hastie | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES ANNE RUSSELL | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|||||
IAIN FERGUS VERNON | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.