42ASHBOURNE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity gives grants to institutions in the furtherance of Jewish education and the relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nechemya Sheinfeld | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||
MARK FRIEDMAN | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
HENRY RAPHAEL GILBERT | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £11.68k | £27.76k | £28.32k | £26.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.42k | £5.12k | £27.96k | £29.06k | £25.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY MAKING GRANTS TO RELIGIOUS EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS WHICH FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH:- I. BY EDUCATING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR RELIGIOUS OBLIGATIONS AND THUS ENABLING THEM TO FULFIL THEIR RELIGIOUS DUTIES AND II. BY PROVIDING COURSES AND OTHER TRAINING TO LEAD TO RABBINICAL DIPLOMAS, TEACHER QUALIFICATIONS AND OTHER RELIGIOUS LEADERS. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 BROOKSIDE ROAD
LONDON
NW11 9NG
- Phone:
- 02082090421
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window