Trustees CDS UK (CLINIC FOR DISSOCIATIVE STUDIES)
Charity number: 1178552

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Nigel Tom MacLennan | Chair | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hoang Nam Nguyen | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Christine Beker | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Dalton | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham House | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Elizabeth Cureton | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Winifred Miles | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.