Financial history WARMINSTER LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1178909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.14k £21.02k £24.49k £29.62k £36.77k
Total expenditure £16.13k £21.04k £24.20k £22.86k £34.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A