Financial history TICKHILL & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1178985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £67.48k £18.53k £69.28k £86.75k £97.69k
Total expenditure £28.52k £17.73k £61.06k £89.14k £62.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.40k £1.40k N/A N/A N/A