Accounts and annual returns TREASURE CHEST

Charity number: 1178219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 January 2025 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 January 2025 194 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 October 2023 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 17 October 2023 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 December 2022 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 December 2022 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 June 2022 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 June 2022 342 days late Download Open in new window