Financial history STOKESLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1178776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £186.55k £159.58k £193.72k £185.60k £145.77k
Total expenditure £190.04k £143.14k £157.55k £193.81k £211.16k
Income from government contracts £45.55k £44.88k £44.88k £44.88k N/A
Income from government grants £55.30k £53.48k £47.93k £73.69k £78.43k