Financial history NONA DOUBLEDAY TRUST

Charity number: 1178527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £190.01k £186.14k £2.08k £14.01k £15.36k
Total expenditure £0 £3.50k £1.89k £1.03k £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A