THE SILLITOE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in general (and Geology students in particular) in the science of Economic Geology by providing suitable funding for education, research, publications, student support and other suitable programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RICHARD HENRY SILLITOE | Chair | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rathbones Trust Company Limited | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
JEANNIE MARY BILLINGTON | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.07k | £12.19k | £14.69k | £22.10k | £31.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £11.43k | £14.30k | £13.34k | £20.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND GEOLOGY STUDENTS IN PARTICULAR) IN THE SCIENCE OF ECONOMIC GEOLOGY BY PROVIDING SUITABLE FUNDING FOR EDUCATION, RESEARCH, PUBLICATIONS, STUDENT SUPPORT AND OTHER SUITABLE PROGRAMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RATHBONE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT
PORT OF LIVERPOOL BUILDING
PIER HEAD
LIVERPOOL
L3 1NW
- Phone:
- 01512437209
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window