Governance DERBYSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1178877

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 21 June 2018: CIO registration
- 13 November 2019: Funds received from 228388 DERBYSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
- 16 November 2020: Funds received from 1037422 MILTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (DERBYSHIRE)
- 23 September 2021: Funds received from 518837 BREADSALL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 06 March 2023: Funds received from 1025016 SUDBURY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (DERBYSHIRE)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
- DFWI (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.