Trustees BRISTOL CCRC TRUST
Charity number: 1178905

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Spens | Chair | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graeme McCann | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Davies | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kathyrn Gordon | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elisabeth Starling | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Charles Bouverie Home | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Parry | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Joseph Alessandro Egitto | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Cameron James Isaac Ophir Laleye | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev TOBY BARNABY FLINT | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.