Financial history LIGHTHOUSE (HAZLEMERE)

Charity number: 1178562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.05k £15.08k £13.01k £5.88k £3.16k
Total expenditure £5.88k £14.76k £11.01k £12.09k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A