CHELMSFORD CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 1180431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £63,700
Total expenditure: £99,322

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah BARFOOT Chair 13 July 2022
None on record
Elliot Boakes Trustee 13 December 2022
None on record
Caroline PORTER Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
BENJAMIN GEOFFREY BACKHOUSE Trustee 20 November 2017
None on record
STEPHANIE MITCHENER Trustee 31 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.01k £43.23k £97.50k £93.50k £63.70k
Total expenditure £26.80k £43.01k £42.60k £69.93k £99.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.76k £38.48k £97.50k £76.00k £47.60k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CIVIC CENTRE
DUKE STREET
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1JE
Phone:
01245 606355