Trustees THE LLANGOLLEN AND DISTRICT AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity Number: 512132

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Cheshire | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Joanne Rachel Burgon | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gleave | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amie Jayne Bickley | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aled Morris | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anthonisz | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PETER HADDY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.